skip to content

Henderson, Robert John

CPSO#: 30473

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Chung Dao 700 Main Street East Hamilton ON L8M 1K7
Date Received: 13 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019