Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jul 2010
Summary:
On July 19, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Larry Scott Henderson committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient. Dr. Henderson was Patient A's family physician from 1985 until the fall of 2000. Beginning in April 1997 and continuing during the time of the doctorpatient relationship, Dr. Henderson engaged in a sexual relationship, including intercourse, with Patient A.
On November 2, 2010, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar revoke Dr. Henderson's certificate of registration effective 11:59 p.m. on November 2, 2010.
2. Dr. Henderson appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Henderson reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, by December 15, 2010, in the amount of $13,130.
4. Dr. Henderson pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,950 on November 2, 2010.
5. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 14 through to Decembre 18, 2009
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Mar 2005
Summary:
On March 24, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Henderson to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient, sexual impropriety and conduct that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Henderson(s certificate of registration for a period of nine (9) months commencing on May 31, 2005;
2. Dr. Henderson attend, at his own expense, and complete the College(s Ethics Course, prior to his return to practice;
3. Dr. Henderson appear before the Committee to be reprimanded; and
3. The results of this proceeding be included in the Register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 24, 2005
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Mar 2004
Summary:
On March 10, 2004, Dr. Henderson admitted to and the Discipline Committee found that he committed professional misconduct in that he engaged in acts relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonuorable or unprofessional. The College withdrew all other allegations.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed:
1. The Registrar to suspend Dr. Henderson(s certificate of registration for 3 months commencing May 3, 2004.
2. The Registrar to impose a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Henderson(s certificate of registration that Dr. Henderson successfully complete the College(s Boundaries Course by November 2004, at his own expense, and provide proof thereof to the Registrar.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 07, 2001