skip to content

Henderson, Julianne Marie

CPSO#: 90603

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Marie, Julianne (used until: 26 Jun 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF Health Services Training Centre
C F B Borden
P O Box 1000 STN Main
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone: (705) 424-1200 Ext. 2603
Fax: (705) 423-2088 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

31 CF H Svcs
C F B Borden
P O Box 1000 STN Main
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Canada
Phone: (705) 424-1200
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIANNE MARIE HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011