skip to content

Henderson, Donald Robert

CPSO#: 19170

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
21 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1964

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.R. Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Thunder Bay Ultrasound 1265 Arthur St E Suite 407 Thunder Bay P7E 6E7
Date Received: 09 Jun 2021


Address: Thunder Bay Medical Centre Diagnostics 63 Algoma St N Suite 150 Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6
Date Received: 09 Jun 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2021