skip to content

Henao-Florez, Oscar

CPSO#: 91828

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Nov 2019
EXPIRY DATE
25 Nov 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Nov 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Antioquia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hospital
7750 Bayview Ave
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: 9058891125 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:09 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 25 Nov 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Nov 2019 Active
 1.    Dr. Oscar Henao-Florez may practise general surgery at Shouldice Hospital
                  in   Thornhill,   Ontario,  while  under  supervision  coordinated  by  a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Henao-Florez's eligibility  to  take the
                  Royal  College  of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the  College  of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Henao-Florez's knowledge, skill, judgment  or  attitude,  does  not
                        provide  the  required reports to the College by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Henao-Florez's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on November 26, 2019, and will expire on or
                  before November 25, 2022, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.