skip to content

Hemphill, Andrew David

CPSO#: 98343

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Byron Family Medical Centre
1228 Commissioners Rd West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone: (519) 472-9670
Fax: (519) 657-1766 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Hemphill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hemphill ( CPSO# 98343 )

Business Address:
1228 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone Number: (519) 472-9670

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID HEMPHILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMPHILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 05 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014