skip to content

Helpman Bek, Limor

CPSO#: 88283

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Limor Helpman Bek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 20 Jun 2008
PEAP - CF - Gynecologic Oncology

University Of Toronto, 21 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020