skip to content

Helmi, Sanaa Talat Helmi Ahmed

CPSO#: 87164

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
42 Monaco Crt
Brampton ON  L7A 1X4
Phone: 905-867-4440 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive E.
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt
USA - Alabama
USA - Connecticut
USA - Kansas
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:04 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANAA TALAT HELMI AHMED HELMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELMI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010