skip to content

Helman, Arthur Barry

CPSO#: 27666

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Non-Binary

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Arthur Helman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Eatonville Care Centre 420 The East Mall Etobicoke, ON M9B 3Z9
Date Received: 01 Jul 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2021