skip to content

Heller, Adrian Mitchell

CPSO#: 105223

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Emergency Dept
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6165 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Adrian Heller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Heller ( CPSO# 105223)

Business Address:
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6165

Business Address:
J-1411 - 825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADRIAN MITCHELL HELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018