skip to content

Helewa, Ramzi Michael

CPSO#: 97294

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital, 501 Smyth Road, Ottawa, ON, K1H 8L6
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2012 to 04 Apr 2012
EL - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2012 to 14 Nov 2012
EL - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016