skip to content

Held, Karen Ann

CPSO#: 85615

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7111 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Karen Held Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Held ( CPSO# 85615 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7111

Business Address:
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 471-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN ANN HELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 26 Sep 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2007