skip to content

Hejja, Paul

CPSO#: 26091

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jun 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University Of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 15229 E Palisades Boulevard Fountain Hills, AZ 85268-4370
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 04 Dec 1989 to 20 Dec 1989
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015