skip to content

Heineck, Katja Monique

CPSO#: 90586

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
House Calls
c/o SPRINT
140 Merton Street, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4S 1A1
Phone: (416) 481-5099
Fax: (416) 481-2590 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Heineck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Heineck ( CPSO# 90586 )

Business Address:
140 Merton Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4S 1A1
Phone Number: (416) 481-5099

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATJA MONIQUE HEINECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEINECK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011