skip to content

Hegazy, Nasr Abd Elmohsen

CPSO#: 85647

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167473400 Ext. 3554 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nasr Hegazy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hegazy ( CPSO# 85647 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:09 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NASR ABD ELMOHSEN HEGAZY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGAZY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 18 Dec 2006
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2010