skip to content

Hegazy, Ahmed Fathy Mohamed

CPSO#: 85918

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - University Campus
339 Windermere Road
Room C3-104
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 34516 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC - Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Rd E, London, ON
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hegazy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hegazy ( CPSO# 85918 )

Business Address:
LHSC - University Campus
Room C3-104
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:06 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMED FATHY MOHAMED HEGAZY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGAZY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Mar 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
CF - Neuroanaesthesia

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2011 to 22 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2013