skip to content

Heeley-Ray, Timothy Robert

CPSO#: 97090

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:16 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019