skip to content

Heddle, Stewart Balfour

CPSO#: 22611

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Sep 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:22 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 2011

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 2, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective September 2, 2011, Dr. Heddle has voluntarily resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.