skip to content

Heaven, Sebastian

CPSO#: 99291

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN HEAVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEAVEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 22 Aug 2012 to 14 Nov 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 15 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Aug 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 04 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 03 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2018