skip to content

Racz, Heather Nicole

CPSO#: 79175

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 954-6021
Fax: (519) 954-6251 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A5W9
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

764 Baker Street
Kingston ON  K7M 6P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 389-4400
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Racz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Racz ( CPSO# 79175 )

Business Address:
Suite E6-206
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Business Address:
Suite 305
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 954-6021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:08 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER NICOLE RACZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007