skip to content

Brien, Heather Jane Caroline

CPSO#: 67428

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1993

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 old bronte Rd suite 480
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 339-2498
Fax: 289 715 2209 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2008
Corporation Name: Brien Orfi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Orfi ( CPSO# 66046 )
Dr. H. Brien ( CPSO# 67428 )

Business Address:
300-1 - 690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
Suite 409
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
Palermo Professional Centre
340/480 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 339-2498

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER JANE CAROLINE BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1993