skip to content

Healy, Conor Michael

CPSO#: 27698

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Conor Healy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Trenton Memorial Hospital 242 King St Trenton, ON K8V 5S6
Date Received: 25 Apr 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019