skip to content

Healy, Brian Daniel

CPSO#: 90584

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Cancer Clinic
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: (519) 751-5588 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Healy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Healy ( CPSO# 90584 )

Business Address:
69 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:27 Aug 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN DANIEL HEALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2013