skip to content

Heale, Liane Doreen

CPSO#: 98000

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main St. W
3A-80
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: 905-521-2601 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. D. Heale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Heale ( CPSO# 98000 )

Business Address:
3A-74
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LIANE DOREEN HEALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2016