skip to content

Hays, Luke Ahmed

CPSO#: 91798

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hays Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hays ( CPSO# 91798 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUKE AHMED HAYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 07 Jul 2009 to 02 Aug 2009
EL - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010