skip to content

Hayley, Bradley Dennis

CPSO#: 88170

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Mar 2008 to 21 Apr 2008
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2013