skip to content

Hayani, Omar

CPSO#: 86775

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (416) 417-8284 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hayani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Hayani ( CPSO# 86775 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 417-8284

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 417-8284

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OMAR HAYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011