skip to content

Hay, Annette Elizabeth

CPSO#: 97154

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Hematology
Burr 2
25 King Street W
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 6694
Fax: (613) 546-8201 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
Division of Hematology
94 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Canada
Phone: (613) 533-2946
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Cancer Research Institute
10 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Annette Hay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hay ( CPSO# 97154 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Divison of Hematology
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2946

Business Address:
Cancer Research Institute
10 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6430

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Hematology
Burr 2
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jan 2012 to 24 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Annette Elizabeth Hay may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of Hematology, Queen's University, in which Dr. Hay holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires  when Dr. Hay no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2018, and expires on June 30, 2020.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Hay's academic appointment at Queen's University, the
                  expiry  date can be extended, subject to the limitations in  paragraph  2
                  above.