skip to content

Hawkes, Christine Marie

CPSO#: 101073

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIE HAWKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWKES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019