skip to content

Hawel, Jeffrey David

CPSO#: 96448

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital Room C8-120
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2963
Fax: (519) 663-3569 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Hawel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hawel ( CPSO# 96448 )

Business Address:
University Hospital
Room C8 - 120
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-2963

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAVID HAWEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017