skip to content

Havey, Thomas Ciaran

CPSO#: 90791

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Dec 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
C/O Medical Staff Office
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Havey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Havey ( CPSO# 90791 )
Dr. S. Moore ( CPSO# 105389)

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 1009
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 30 Mar 2014
EL - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 19 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Mar 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 24 Mar 2021 Active
 
As from March 24, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Thomas Ciaran Havey in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Havey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Havey has voluntarily resigned his prescribing privileges with respect to narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances and monitored drugs, as amended from time to time in the governing regulations.







Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 24, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Thomas Ciaran Havey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 24, 2021:

Dr. Havey has voluntarily resigned his prescribing privileges with respect to narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances and monitored drugs, as amended from time to time in the governing regulations