skip to content

Haverstock, John Patrick

CPSO#: 90749

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oakville Medical Centre
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 310
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: 289-813-2004
Fax: 289-813-0354 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Forward Haverstock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Forward ( CPSO# 87026 )
Dr. J. Haverstock ( CPSO# 90749 )

Business Address:
MUMC Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Suite 2N491
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
North Oakville Medical
310 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (289) 813-2004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN PATRICK HAVERSTOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAVERSTOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2014 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2014