skip to content

Haukioja, Ari Heimo Olavi

CPSO#: 27405

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cobourg Clinic
44 University Avenue East
P O Box 86
Cobourg ON  K9A 4K4
Phone: (905) 372-3323
Fax: (905) 372-3692 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Haukioja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haukioja ( CPSO# 27405 )

Business Address:
Cobourg Clinic
44 University Avenue East
Cobourg ON  K9A 2G5
Phone Number: (905) 372-3323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Oct 2020
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Mar 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 09 Mar 2022 Active
                
As from July 24, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ari Heimo Olavi
Haukioja, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Haukioja 
to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

With the exception of his inpatient hospital practice of labour and
delivery, Dr. Haukioja has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing
privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances and
preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from
time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
Narcotic Drugs
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)                         Relinquished

Narcotic Preparations
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)                          Relinquished

Controlled Drugs
(from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
under the Food and Drugs
 Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                                                 Relinquished

Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
(from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
Targeted Substances Regulations made 
under the Controlled Drugs and 
Substances Act., S.C., 1996, S.C.,19)                               Relinquished

All Other Monitored Drugs
(as defined under the Narcotic Safety and                   Relinquished
Awareness Act, S.O., 2010, c. 22)