skip to content

Hauck, Tanya Sabrina

CPSO#: 101313

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
33 Russell St
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. x34394 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bellwood Health Services
175 Brentcliffe Rd
Toronto ON  M4G 0C5
Canada
Phone: 1 800-387-6198
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brantford RAAM Clinic
347 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3S 3N2
Canada
Phone: 519-718-0695
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bellwood Health Services Inc. Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TANYA SABRINA HAUCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAUCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2018