Hatlapa, Karolina Maria (CPSO#: 99575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Phone: 4167412273
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Poland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Karolina  Maria  Hatlapa  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
            medicine, only.