skip to content

Hastings, David Eric

CPSO#: 18612

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Date of Death: 2-Mar-2010

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004