skip to content

Hastie, Ian Gordon

CPSO#: 22878

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jun 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ian G. Hastie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Huntsville Memorial Hospital 100 Frank Miller Drive Huntsville, ON P1H 1H7
Date Received: 15 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015