skip to content

Hassanlou, Mojgan

CPSO#: 86409

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416)480-4762
Fax: (416)480-4481 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1101 Kingston Road
Unit 230
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Canada
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Toronto ON  L3Y9A2
Canada
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mojgan Hassanlou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 13 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOJGAN HASSANLOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSANLOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2013