skip to content

Hassan, Tariq Mahmood

CPSO#: 94215

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 5444900 Ext. 53163
Fax: (613) 540-6113 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. T. Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hassan ( CPSO# 94215 )

Business Address:
Providence Care Queen's University
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:12 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TARIQ MAHMOOD HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2020