skip to content

Hassan, Hanadi Abdel Rahim Ahmed

CPSO#: 87565

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alliston Family Health Team
New Tecumseth Medical Care Centre
120 Mill Street East, Unit 5
Tottenham ON  L0G 1W0
Phone: (905) 936 3331
Fax: (905) 936 3232 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hanadi Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hassan ( CPSO# 87565 )

Business Address:
Alliston Family Health Team
Windsor Health Centre
P O Box 280
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1V5
Phone Number: (705) 435-8887

Business Address:
30 Dunham Drive
Alliston ON  L9R 0G1
Phone Number: (705) 434-2141

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANADI ABDEL RAHIM AHMED HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009