skip to content

Hassan, Ayman Emam Hassanien

CPSO#: 95040

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 May 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Center
Suite 102
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 935-8044
Fax: (807) 698 6399 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ayman Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hassan ( CPSO# 95040 )

Business Address:
Medical Centre
Suite 201
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7

Business Address:
102-984 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: 807-935-8044


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:24 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016 Active
             1.    Dr. Ayman Emam Hassanien Hassan may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Neurology, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School
                        of Medicine, in which Dr. Hassan holds an academic appointment at
                        the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.