skip to content

Hassa, Agnieszka

CPSO#: 84921

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. A Hassa Medicine Professional
Corp Plastic&Reconstructive Surgery
Suite LL4
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 735-9818
Fax: (705) 735-9391 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Hassa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 27 2016
Corporation Name: Dr. A. Hassa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hassa ( CPSO# 84921 )

Business Address:
Suite LL4
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 735-9818

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AGNIESZKA HASSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2012