skip to content

Hasnain, Homa

CPSO#: 92461

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
12 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2021