skip to content

Hashim, Shahzad

CPSO#: 94882

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Division of Nephrology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 3470
Fax: (905) 813-3830 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Medical Arts Building
2000 Credit Valley Road. Suite 310
Mississauga ON  L5M4N4
Canada
Phone: 9059970096
Fax: 9058281147
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Hashim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hashim ( CPSO# 94882 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Critical Care Unit
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Mar 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Nephrology Effective:13 Jan 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2016 Active
 Dr.  Shahzad  Hashim  may  practice  medicine  independently  in internal
                  medicine and nephrology.