skip to content

Hashemi, Narges

CPSO#: 89053

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Khoshnood, Narges (used until: 10 Oct 2019 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: (416) 586-4804 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Narges Hashemi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hashemi ( CPSO# 89053 )

Business Address:
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
4th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NARGES HASHEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHEMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 30 Mar 2009 to 01 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 17 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011