skip to content

Hasan, Yaser M H R

CPSO#: 97578

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Manchester Medical School, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:18 Apr 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 11 Jul 2012
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019