skip to content

Hasan, Fauzia

CPSO#: 85576

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6597 Ext. 6085 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Fauzia Hasan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hasan ( CPSO# 85576 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
1720 - 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6085

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:10 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FAUZIA HASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2006 to 21 Dec 2006
AVP - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 06 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2007 to 06 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2008 to 06 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2009 to 06 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013