skip to content

Harvey, Shauna Marie

CPSO#: 96266

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 08 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017