skip to content

Harvey, Philip Jacobus

CPSO#: 98297

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: PJ Harvey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Harvey ( CPSO# 98297 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delphi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Business Address:
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 766-1360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP JACOBUS HARVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARVEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014