skip to content

Hartwick, Karl Robert

CPSO#: 25661

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 1135
Haliburton ON  K0M1S0 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Karl Hartwick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Haliburton Family Medical Center 7217 Gelert Road PO Box 870 Haliburton, Ontario K0M 1S0
Date Received: 14 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KARL ROBERT HARTWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTWICK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2021